Marshall v. Higgins et al
Plaintiff: Michael Marshall
Defendant: Doe, Eric Higgins, Adams, Waters, Robinson, Ezell, Does Commissary; Federal Government; Marshals Office, Pulaski County Detention Center and Ramsey
Case Number: 4:2019cv00629
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DECISION that Mr. Marshall's claims against Eric Higgins and the Doe Defendants be DISMISSED, without prejudice. Mr. Marshall's claims regarding commissary charges also should be DISMISSED, without prejudice. Claims regarding the adequacy of the Detention Center's grievance procedure and all claims against the Pulaski County Detention Center should be DISMISSED, with prejudice. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/7/2019. (csf)
November 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re Summons Issued. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the description as follows, "Summons Issued as to Adams, Ezell, Ramsey, Robinson, and Waters and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service." (cmn)
October 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to Adams, Ezell, Ramsey, Robinson, and Waters and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ajt) (Docket text modified on 11/1/2019 to correct the description.)(cmn)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michael Marshall. (Docketed pursuant to #12 Order)(ajt)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing the Clerk to add Sergeant Waters, Sergeant Ezell, Deputy Ramsey, Deputy Adams, and Deputy Robinson as party Defendants; directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for Defendants Waters, Ezell, Ramsey, Adams, and Robinson; and directing USMS to serve copies of #2 Complaint, #3 Addendum, #6 Amended Complaint, #7 Motion, and #9 Addendum filed by Michael Marshall and summonses for these Defendants, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs of security. The Court will address Mr. Marshall's other claims and his allegations against other Defendants in a separate Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/31/2019. (ajt)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Marshall (kbc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Michael Marshall. (llg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Michael Marshall. (llg)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Mr. Marshall's jail trust account, until the $350 filing fee is paid in full; directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Pulaski County Detention Facility and appropriate ADC offices; and directing Mr. Marshall to file an amended complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/25/2019. (kdr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Marshall. (kdr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Michael Marshall.(kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 MOTION and #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original documents were attached to the docket in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct documents were added as attachments to #1 and #2 docket entries and are attached hereto for review by the parties.(cmn)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying #1 IFP; directing the Clerk to enclose an IFP application with a copy of this Order; directing the Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay a $400 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/11/2019. (kdr)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Michael Marshall. (kdr)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Michael Marshall.(kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Marshall. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Higgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Commissary; Federal Government; Marshals Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?