Cooney v. Arkansas, State of et al
Plaintiff: Krishonn Cooney
Defendant: Arkansas, State of, Taylor Doobie, Nathan Watkins and Willcut
Case Number: 4:2021cv00717
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Status Update by Krishonn Cooney. (ldb)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court assesses an initial partial fee of $13.20. After the initial fee is collected, Cooney's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from Cooney's prison trust account and forward to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been paid in full. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Conway County Detention Center. This case is stayed and Cooney can move to reopen the case after final disposition of his state case, including any appeal. If Cooney doesn't file a timely motion to reopen or a status report by 9/8/2022 then the Court will reopen the case and dismiss it without prejudice. #13 Motion for status update denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2021. (jak)
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Status Update by Krishonn Cooney. (kdr)
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Krishonn Cooney. (kdr)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Cooney still must submit a complete application by 9/13/2021. If he doesn't, then the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Cooney an in forma pauperis application with a copy of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/2021. (jak)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Krishonn Cooney. (llg)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Krishonn Cooney. (llg)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice Cooney's application to proceed in forma pauperis #4 . Cooney must submit a complete application by 9/13/2021. If he doesn't the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Cooney another in forma pauperis application with a copy of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/13/2021. (jak)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Krishonn Cooney. (llg)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #5 Affidavit. CORRECTION: The original documents attached in error (incorrect image sequence) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct documents were added to docket entries #4 and #5 and are attached hereto for review by the parties. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(jak)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Krishonn Cooney. (llg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2021: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Krishonn Cooney. (llg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2021: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/12/2021. (jak)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Cooney to either pay the filing and administrative fees or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis by 9/13/2021. If he doesn't, then the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Cooney an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/12/2021. (jak)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Krishonn Cooney. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooney v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishonn Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Doobie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willcut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?