Ricks v. Adams et al

Plaintiff: James E Ricks, Jr
Defendant: Ed Adams, Hunter, J Jackson and Joshua King
Case Number: 5:2008cv00055
Filed: February 28, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER administratively closing this case and allowing plaintiff to file a motion to re-open this action upon deft King's ability to attend a trial in this District. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/16/10. (bkp)
January 22, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 110 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Mike Hurst. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/22/10. (bkp)
November 10, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/10/09. (bkp)
July 23, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion to Amend/Correct to the extent that such a stay shall be applied only to deft King; and granting 85 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/23/09. (bkp)
February 27, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing defts Randle and Royal from plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/27/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Ricks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?