Winston v. Evans et al

Plaintiff: Eric Winston
Defendant: Fred Evans, Lasaundra M Malone and Reed
Case Number: 5:2008cv00231
Filed: August 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2011 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds in the sum of $522.72 to Stephen L. Curry for out-of-pocket expenses incurred while representing plaintiff; granting 166 MOTION for Taxation of Costs of Appointed Counsel filed by Eric Winston. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/26/11. (bkp)
January 25, 2011 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement reached by the parties. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/25/11. (bkp)
November 18, 2010 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's Motion for Settlement Conference in case 5:08CV00204 (docket entry #127); the Clerk is directed to randomly assign a different Magistrate Judge to conduct a settlement conference for all three cases, 5:08CV00204, 5:08CV00230, and 5:08CV00231. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/18/10. (vjt)
March 29, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to provide to counsel for plaintiff the defendant Fred Evans' address filed under seal; and directing the plaintiff's counsel not to provide the sealed information to plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/29/10. (bkp)
October 2, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 111 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 104 Motion to Dismiss filed by Cynthia Reed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/2/09. (bkp)
July 22, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations 90 denying 89 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Eric Winston. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/22/09. (bkp)
February 19, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion for Default Judgment; Adopting 56 Partial Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/19/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lasaundra M Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?