Orndorff v. Correctional Medical Services et al

Plaintiff: Michael Ray Orndorff
Defendant: Shaw, Mullins, Correctional Medical Services, Bradley and Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2008cv00294
Filed: November 5, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 80 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing complaint with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/19/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that defts' 63 70 Motions to Dismiss be granted and the complaint be dismissed with prejudice . Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp) (Docket entry modified on 2/22/2010 to correct the filing event and the description of the document filed.) (thd).
January 27, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the name of defendant Bradley to Ashley Bradley Watson on the court's docket. Signed DOC by Mary A. Johnson, Deputy Clerk, on 1/27/10. (bkp) Modified on 1/27/2010 to change the name of the signer.(bkp).
January 4, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Partial Report and Recommendations; and granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defts CMS and Mullins. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/4/10. (bkp)
November 18, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts Waseem Shah and Ashley Bradley without prepayment of fees therefor at the addresses provided under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/18/09. (bkp)
November 5, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that defts provide the last-known addresses of defts Shaw and Bradley within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/5/09. (bkp)
April 20, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 14 Motion to Dismiss filed by defts. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/20/09. (bkp)
March 2, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mullins, Correctional Medical Services within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/2/09. (bkp)
January 13, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 9 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; Defendant Larry Norris is DISMISSED from plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/09. (mkf)
December 17, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that service is appropriate for defts CMS, Inc., Dr. Shaw, Medical Administrator Mullins and LPN Bradley, directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on defts c/o Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/17/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orndorff v. Correctional Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Orndorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?