Burgie v. Golden et al

Plaintiff: Eric C Burgie
Defendant: Darryl Golden, Charles Freyder, Does, Sherry Conrad, B Bealer and C Gibson
Case Number: 5:2009cv00136
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2011 186 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with the 185 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/9/11. (kpr)
June 7, 2011 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 174 Motion for Reconsideration of 172 Order denying Motion for Copies. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/7/11. (kpr)
May 9, 2011 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 159 Partial Report and Recommendations, 157 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Eric C Burgie and denying the 157 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Eric C Burgie. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/9/11. (kpr)
September 21, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 130 plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 114 plaintiff's Motion to Compel; and dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/21/10. (bkp)
August 30, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 112 Partial Report and Recommendations that 103 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Eric C Burgie be denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/30/10. (bkp)
August 12, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 108 Motion for Reconsideration of 105 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/12/10. (bkp)
July 27, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 95 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 88 91 Motions to Amend/Correct filed by Eric C Burgie. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/27/10. (bkp)
July 12, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 92 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/12/10. (bkp)
September 14, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Compel; denying 29 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/14/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgie v. Golden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric C Burgie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Freyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Bealer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?