Holt v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Robert Bryan Holt
Defendant: Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs, Correctional Medical Services and Scott
Case Number: 5:2009cv00167
Filed: June 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 63 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/21/10. (vjt)
April 29, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion for Copies and directing defendant to forward to plaintiff copies of the missing pages of his deposition, as noted in his motion, within 10 days of the date of this Order; denying 53 Motion to Compel and directing plaintiff to file a response to deft's summary judgment motion within 20 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/29/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice filed by Robert Bryan Holt and directing plaintiff to file a response to defts' summary judgment motion within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)
August 7, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 6 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; defendants Langhammer, West, Snyder, Hubbard, Norris, Hobbs, and CMS are hereby DISMISSED from plaintiff's complaint, for failure to state a claim.. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/7/09. (mkf)
July 23, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that service is appropriate for deft Dr. Scott and that the Clerk prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the summons, original and amended complaints on deft c/o Humphries & Lewis Law Firm without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/23/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bryan Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?