Briley v. Cole et al

Plaintiff: Eddie Briley, Jr
Defendant: Ronnie Cole, Tyra Tyler, Edward Adams, Judy Browrly, Baughmon, Randle, Rawls and Jones
Case Number: 5:2009cv00220
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part and rejecting in part the proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting 71 Defendants' second motion for summary judgment, as to plaintiff's free exercise of religion and failure to protect claims, and those claims are hereby dismissed with prejudice; and denying 71 Defendants' second motion for summary judgment as to plaintiff's excessive force claim. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/4/11. (hph)
March 11, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 64 Partial Report and Recommendations denying all official claims with prejudice; dismissing pltf's inadequate medical care and retaliation claims against defts Randle, Royal, Adams, Browley, Cole and Tyler with prejudice; dismi ssing defts Royal, Randle, and Tyler with prejudice; and allowing plaintiff to proceed with his failure to protect, excessive force, and free exercise claims against defts Cole, Adams, Baughmon, Browley, Jones and Wright; and certifying that an ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/11/11. (kpr)
December 18, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's due process challenge to his disciplinary conviction with prejudice and allowing plaintiff to proceed with his remaining claims against defts; certifying that an i fp appeal taken from this order would not be in good faith; and directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for defts, the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, complaint and this order on those defts without prepayment of fees or costs therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/18/09. (bkp)
August 20, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eddie Briley, Jr; Clerk is directed to send to plaintiff a prison trust fund calculation sheet which plaintiff has 30 days in which to file a properly completed calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/20/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briley v. Cole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Briley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyra Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Browrly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baughmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rawls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?