Franklin v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Chris Franklin
Defendant: Larry Norris, Gaylon Lay, James Gibson and Gleenover Knight
Case Number: 5:2009cv00293
Filed: September 16, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 77 Order Dismissing Case and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/6/11. (kpr)
February 28, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a response to defts' 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/28/11. (kpr)
December 7, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/7/10. (bkp)
September 10, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 50 Motion for Disclosure from the pending motions list and re-docketing as a request for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/10/10. (bkp)
March 18, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/18/10. (bkp)
March 11, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/11/10. (bkp)
March 4, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motions for Hearing and to grant motion to amend complaint are denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/4/10. (bkp)
December 15, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Reconsideration of designation of case as a 1983 petition 3 ; finding that defts Gaylon Lay, James Gibson and Gleenover Knight should be reinstated; assessing an initial partial filing fee of $10.33 to be withdraw n from plaintiff's prison trust account with withdrawals to follow until the balance of the $350 statutory filing fee is paid in full; directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint and summons on the defts in care of ADC Compliance Office, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/15/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gleenover Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?