Collins v. Jones

Plaintiff: Kingrale Collins
Defendant: Jones
Case Number: 5:2009cv00323
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Jones against Kingrale Collins re 10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/21/10. (bkp)
December 17, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the $350 filing fee, failure to comply with LR 5.5(c)(2), and failure to respond to the Court's order 1 . The Court certify that an ifp a ppeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 12/17/2009. (lej)
October 26, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward an IFP application, calculation sheet, and certificate, to Plaintiff, who is directed to submit, no later than 30 days after the entry of this order, either the $350.00 statutory filing fee, or to complete an d sign the ifp application, and file it, along with the completed calculation sheet and certificate; pltf's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint; service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/26/09. (mkf) Modified on 10/27/2009 to correct typographical error. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingrale Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?