Maxwell/G-Doffee v. Tyler et al

Plaintiff: Don Merceleany R Maxwell/G-Doffee
Defendant: A Tyler, Justine M Minor, John Doe and James Gibson
Case Number: 5:2009cv00325
Filed: October 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 87 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/15/11. (vjt)
September 23, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to respond to defts' 61 Motion for Summary Judgment no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/23/11. (vjt)
September 20, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 59 Motion for Default Judgment, which might be better characterized as a motion to compel; defts are directed to bring the audio tape of the March 13, 2009, disciplinary hearing to the October 17, 2011, evidentiary hearing, or any other hearing held in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/20/11. (vjt)
March 8, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 43 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/8/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell/G-Doffee v. Tyler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Merceleany R Maxwell/G-Doffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justine M Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?