Hobbs v. Falco et al

Plaintiff: Harold Hobbs
Defendant: Fulco, Wendy Kelly, C Green, Don Avlin Green, Parsona and Stewart
Case Number: 5:2009cv00368
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 116 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing the case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/11/11. (kpr)
May 3, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 103 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting the 95 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alva Green, Charlotte Green, Lamont Parsons, Brenda Fulco and dismissing these defts with prejudice; denying the 99 Motion to Dismiss Party Alva Green filed by Harold Hobbs. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/3/11. (kpr)
November 19, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Notice of Appeal filed by Harold Hobbs of 92 Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/19/10. (bkp)
July 30, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 65 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting 9 motion to dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Wendy Kelly and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Kelly with prejudice and removing her name as a party defendant. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/30/10. (bkp)
April 28, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Partial Report and Recommendations; Plaintiff's supplemental responses to defendant Kelly's 9 Motion for Summary Judgment are due on or before May 12, 2010; this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge H. David Young. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/28/2010. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs v. Falco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Avlin Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parsona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?