Hill v. Rectenwald et al

Plaintiff: Jessie Hill
Defendant: Robert Rectenwald, James Gibson, Jeffrey Ewell, Michael Hughes, Wendy L Kelley, David N White, Randall E Manus, Ray Hobbs, John Doe and Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2010cv00030
Filed: February 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 194 Order dismissing the case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/10/11. (kpr)
May 16, 2011 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 181 Motion for Reconsideration re 178 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/16/11. (kpr)
April 13, 2011 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 173 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting 144 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Hughes, Jeffrey Ewell and dismissing these defts from plaintiff's complaint; denying pltf's motion for summary judgment in part, with respect to his allegations against defts Ewell and Hughes; ruling on pltf's summary judgment with respect to deft Rectenwald is held in abeyance, pending defts' response. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/13/11. (kpr)
March 10, 2011 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendants are directed to provide the Court with a complete copy of Plaintiff's September 29, 2010 deposition within 10 days of the date of this Order. The Court will then rule on the 144 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Hughes, Jeffrey Ewell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/10/11. (kpr)
February 17, 2011 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 157 Witness List filed by Jessie Hill; and directing the ADC to ensure the plaintiff's attendance at the hearing, together with a copy of plaintiff's medical records and institutional file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/17/11. (bkp)
February 14, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 142 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 148 Motion for Sanctions; denying 148 Motion to Compel; granting 152 Motion to Withdraw a Page from his Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/14/11. (bkp)
December 7, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 132 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/7/10. (bkp)
November 14, 2010 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 123 Partial Report and Recommendations and denyng 112 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jessie Hill. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/14/10. (bkp)
November 1, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 112 Motion to Compel; denying 112 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 112 Motion for Trial without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1/10. (bkp)
August 17, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to remove the 74 Joint MOTION for Sanctions filed by Robert Rectenwald from the pending motions list, as the Court granted the motion in part on August 6, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/17/10. (bkp)
July 6, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion for Reconsideration re 65 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/6/10. (bkp)
June 28, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 45 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety; granting in part 33 Motion to Dismiss with respect the plaintiff's allegations against defendants Kelly, Gibson and White and denying with respect to plaintiff's allegations of failure to protect against defendants Ewell and Hughes. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/28/2010. (thd)
April 20, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defendants Manus, Hobbs, Norris, and John Doe Rehab Program Manager from plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/20/10. (bkp)
March 31, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, original and amended complaints on defts Hughes, Ewell, Gibson, White and Kelley in care of ADC Compliance Office, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550; and upon deft Rectenwald in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/31/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Rectenwald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rectenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Ewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy L Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David N White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall E Manus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?