Roberts v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Brunson Roberts
Defendant: Larry Norris, Ronald Dobbs, Ray Hobbs, Grant Harris, Wendy Kelley, Kay Howell, Ifediora, Sherri Conrad, Ragland, James McGill, D Howard, J Nwachuku, Johnson, Sector and John Does
Case Number: 5:2010cv00063
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 67 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this case with prejudice as to pltf's claims against Wendy Kelley and Nnamdi Ifediora, and without prejudice as to all his other claims; the relief sought is denied; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal taken from this Judgment and the accompanying Order is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/4/11. (vjt)
February 16, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying part pltf's 62 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections; Objections to R&R due 3/2/11. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/16/11. (vjt)
August 6, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 44 Motion for Reconsideration re 38 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/6/10. (vjt)
July 22, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 30 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 16 Motion for TRO 4 and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/22/10. (bkp)
July 9, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to provide, no later than 30 days after the entry of this order, an address at which deft Ifediora may be served. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/9/10. (bkp)
May 11, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pltf is allowed to proceed on his claims that defts Ifediora and Wendy Kelley denied him adequate medical care for his spinal problems and headaches; pltf's cla ims against all other defts are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; John Does, Grant Harris, Ray Hobbs, D Howard, Kay Howell, Johnson, James McGill, Larry Norris, J Nwachuku, Dewayne Perry, Ragland, Sector, Webb, Sherri Conrad and Ronald Dobbs terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/11/10. (vjt)
April 7, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for defts Ifediora and Kelley and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint 2 , amended complaint, this order, and summons, on them without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/7/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brunson Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ifediora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Nwachuku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?