Christopher v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Roderick Christopher
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, Tucker and Cole
Case Number: 5:2010cv00141
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 73 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/9/11. (kpr)
January 18, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying pltf of his opportunity to file a response and statement of facts opposing defts' 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment, within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/18/11. (vjt)
August 4, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 39 Partial Report and Recommendations that 33 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Roderick Christopher be denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/4/10. (bkp)
July 20, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding the 36 Objections to Report and Recommendations to be without merit. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/20/10. (bkp)
July 16, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against the Arkansas Department of Correction with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/16/10. (bkp)
July 12, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to re-issue a summons for deft B. Cole at the address filed under seal and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the complaint, addendum to complaint, amended complaint with any attachments, and a summons on this deft. without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/12/10. (bkp)
June 9, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons and complaints 1 14 on defts Tucker and Cole without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/9/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?