Mayberry v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Edward Eugene Mayberry, Jr
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, Ray Hobbs, Lymon, Kitchens and McCormick
Case Number: 5:2010cv00307
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 26 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defts dismissing all claims in this action with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/29/12. (vjt)
April 3, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 , 23 Plaintiff is directed to file a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgments and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts on or before 04/14/2012. Defendants, may choose to file a Reply within 7 days of the filing of the Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/03/2012. (kcs)
February 29, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' request to extend the deadline for filing dispositive motions; Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/29/12. (vjt)
April 19, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL, defts Lymon, Kitchens, and McCormick are dismissed without prejudice due to lack of service; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/19/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayberry v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Eugene Mayberry, Jr
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lymon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?