Cole v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Albert Lynn Cole
Defendant: Demery, Arkansas Department of Correction and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2011cv00232
Filed: September 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Court's 29 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, judgment is entered dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/7/2012. (dmn)
July 24, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW rejecting Mr. Cole's claim for punitive damages and that Officer Demery did not violate the requirements of the Eighth and Fourteenth Amendments. In the alternative, the Court concludes that Officer Demery is entitled to qualified immunity. A judgment for deft Officer Demery will be entered separately. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/24/12. (kpr)
June 29, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is granted as to plaintiff's claims against the ADC and Ray Hobbs and denied as to the claims against Officer Demery in his individual capacity. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/29/12. (kpr)
May 23, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 12 Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit E to defts' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/23/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demery
Represented By: Shawn J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Represented By: Shawn J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Shawn J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Lynn Cole
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?