Muhammad v. Harris et al

Plaintiff: Juqan Demetrius Muhammad
Defendant: Green, Grant Harris, Dawn A Jones, Rosland Williams, Sandra Bonner, Wendy Kelly, Kelly, Ray Hobbs, Curtis Meinzer, Martion, D Goldmen and Compton
Case Number: 5:2011cv00278
Filed: October 25, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 60 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice, as frivolous; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/24/12. (vjt)
April 5, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 46 MOTION to Dismiss deft Dawanda Jones from this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/5/12. (vjt)
April 4, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of defts Donald Compton, Darryl Golden, Patty Green, Grant Harris, Ray Hobbs, Wendy Kelley, Natasha Martin, Curtis Meinzer, and Rosalyn Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/4/12. (kpr)
March 28, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to respond to 42 MOTION for Default Judgment against Sandra Bonner filed by Juqan Demetrius Muhammad within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/28/12. (kpr)
February 13, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 34 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's Motions for TRO 5 and for Preliminary Injunction 24 , which this Court construes as Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/13/12. (vjt)
January 23, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defts' 27 MOTION to Stay Discovery, pending resolution of their Motion to Dismiss, is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/23/12. (vjt)
January 17, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for deft Sandra Bonner. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on deft at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees. The pltf shall file additional identifying information about deft Dawn Jones within 10 days of the date of this Order. Failure to obtain service on this deft within 120 days may support dismissal of this deft. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/17/12. (kpr)
December 8, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to provide to the Court the last-known addresses of defts Jones and Bonner, under seal, within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/8/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn A Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosland Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Goldmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juqan Demetrius Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?