Sanders v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: Courtney Sanders
Defendant: Lawrence Davis and Donald Bobbitt
Case Number: 5:2012cv00017
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 24 defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker. (rhm)
May 15, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential and sensitive information. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/15/2013. (jak)
May 3, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER directing that defts not respond to pltf's recent FOIA request unless and until this Court orders defts to do so after ruling on the merits of defts' motion for expedited protective order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/3/13. (kpr)
May 14, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 2 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/14/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Sanders
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Bobbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?