Aaron v. Howell et al

Plaintiff: Kameon Vankeis Aaron
Defendant: Kilgore, K Howell, F Walls, Shamon Tyler, Lydia Godfrey, Barbara Williams, Grant Harris and Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 5:2012cv00180
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Aaron's claims against Howell, Walls, Tyler, Godfrey, Williams, Harris, Kilgore, and the Arkansas Department of Correction are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/13/2013. (rhm)
October 10, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carol Kilgore. Plaintiff is directed to file a response to the motion and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/10/13. (kpr)
April 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING granting 19 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carol Kilgore. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/18/13. (kpr)
March 19, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carol Kilgore. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/19/13. (kpr)
July 30, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of deft Carol Kilgore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/30/12. (kpr)
July 6, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Howell, Godfrey, Williams, Harris, and the Arkansas Department of Correction without prejudice pursuant to his amended complaint. His claims against defts Tyler and Walls are dismissed without prejudice because plaintiff has not stated claims upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/6/12. (kpr)
June 15, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for deft Sgt. Kilgore, and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on deft Sgt. Kilgore in care of the AR Board of Correction and Community Punishment Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/15/12. (kpr) Modified on 6/15/2012 to correct typographical error (kpr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Howell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamon Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kameon Vankeis Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?