Jones v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: David Jones
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, James Banks, Curtis Meinzer, Wendy Kelly, Gina Snyder, Jennifer McBride, Bonds, Ables, Stephens, Demery, Tonda Spencer, Allen, Jackson, Clemons, Wise, Ricky McCarroll, Cody Singleton, Lisa Robinson, Karla Taggart, Carolyn Bennett, Melissa Ann Jarrett, Tiffany Compton, Cynthia Newton and Brandy Malony
Case Number: 5:2012cv00456
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2015 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 192 Request to Clarify Order. The record reflects that on March 27, 2015, there being no timely objections filed by Plaintiff, the Court entered two orders adopting the magistrate judge's recommended partial disposition, 176 , and r ecommended disposition, 177 and entered judgment dismissed plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff on the same day filed a motion to extend time to file objections and he filed objections to the recommended disposition. Further, plaintiff filed a mot ion for a new trial or to amend or alter the judgment on April 8, 2015. In the Court's Order dated April 20, 2015, the Court granted the motion for extension of time to file objections concerning the medical defendants, considered the objections, reviewed the record de novo and denied the motion for new trial/alter or amend judgment, 191 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/6/2015. (jak)
March 27, 2015 186 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 184 185 Orders entered on this day, this case is dismissed and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 03/27/2015. (rhm)
July 17, 2014 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 161 Partial Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 140 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and/or Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/17/2014. (mcz)
May 9, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 136 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Recusal and denying 138 Plaintiff's Motion for Copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/09/2014. (kcs)
April 1, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to prepare three new subpoenas duces tecum for the specific medical records listed in Plantiff's Motion 127 in which the recipients will have 14 days to produce the records to the Court. The U. S. Marshal is directed to serve the subpoenas duces tecum without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/01/2014. (kcs)
March 26, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 125 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel; denying 126 Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel; granting 127 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of subpoenas duces tecum; and denying Plaintiff's 128 Motion for Supplemental Disclosures and Responses. Dispositive motion deadline is extended to 5/9/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/26/2014. (kcs)
January 15, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to refrain from docketing any future discovery from Plaintiff. Plaintiff's 107 Motion for extension of time is denied. Plaintiff's 95 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is denied. Plaintiff's 109 Motion for Order to Secure Video Evidence is granted, and Defendants must, within fourteen days of the entry of this Order, comply with the instructions contained herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/15/2014. (jak)
January 6, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 92 Motion for Reconsideration re 91 Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/6/14. (kpr)
December 5, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 93 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 78 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART; pltf may proceed with his inadequate medical care claims against defts Bonds, Maloney, Hubbard and Iko from 6/17/11 until 8/13/12, and his claims against them for the medical care they provided after 8/13/12 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to a lack of exhaustion. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/5/13. (vjt)
October 18, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/18/2013. (kcs)
August 22, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days a Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 78 and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed.R.Civ.P.56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set for th in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/22/2013. (kcs)
June 28, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 61 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/28/13. (vjt)
May 23, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 36 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's 33 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and 34 Motion for Default Judgment are DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/23/13. (vjt)
March 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting, in their entirety, 7 the Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition; allowing Plaintiff to proceed with his failure to protect, excessive, and inadequate medical care claims against Defendants Bonds, Demery, Johnson, Clemons, Wise, McCarroll, Singleton, Malony, Iko, Hubbard, and Correctional Officer Snyder; dismissing, without prejudice, all other claims for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; directing the Clerk to prepare a summ ons for Bonds, Malony, Iko, Hubbard; and directing the USMS to serve the summons, 2 Complaint, 6 Amended Complaint, and this Order on them through the ADC Compliance Division without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/12/2013. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ables
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonda Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky McCarroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Ann Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Malony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?