Hay et al v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: DeMarico Jamond Hay and Donte Chambers
Defendant: Keishaundra Malone, Lyndon Cordell Allen, Varner Unit, Daryl Gardner, Joe Page, III and Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 5:2012cv00462
Filed: December 28, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 17 Order entered in this case, Hay's 1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/15/2013. (dmn)
April 4, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to provide to the Court a current address by 4/19/13, or the Court will dismiss the complaint without prejudice. 9 , 10 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/4/13. (kpr)
April 2, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 10 Mail Returned. Plaintiff shall notify this Court of his current address and his intent to continue prosecution within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/2/13. (kpr)
February 21, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 2 Order Directing plaintiffs to either file the $350 filing fee or an application to proceed ifp. Donte Chambers is dismissed from the complaint without prejudice for his failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/21/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hay et al v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keishaundra Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndon Cordell Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varner Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeMarico Jamond Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donte Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?