Bardin v. Wright et al

Plaintiff: Matthew D Bardin
Defendant: Scott Taylor, Paul Matthew Wright, James Taylor and Johnathan Lightfoot
Case Number: 5:2013cv00013
Filed: January 22, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court finds that plaintiff's 80 motion to dismiss and 81 motion for costs should be and are hereby granted. All claims in this action are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to distribute to S pencer F. Robinson the amount of $150.00 from the reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses fund. A copy of this order, along with the application for reimbursement, shall be placed in the fund and maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/27/2014. (ks)
January 28, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 64 Proposed Findings and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 60 motion for summary judgment; dismissing Defendant Chaney as a party to this action; and dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Lightfoot without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/28/2014. (ks)
June 18, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 37 Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, pltf's 36 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss his claims against deft Taylor is GRANTED; pltf's claims against Scott Taylor are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/18/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bardin v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Matthew Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew D Bardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?