Ewell v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Damont Ewell
Defendant: M Austin, Wendy Kelly, Warren, Moore and Bland
Case Number: 5:2013cv00276
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 43 Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/26/2014. (rhm)
January 13, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to provide a present address or obtain service on deft. Dr. Moore within 30 days of the date of this Order. 2 13 30 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/13/14. (kpr)
October 24, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 5 Order directing issuance of summons. Summons was returned, unexecuted, on defts Moore and Austin. These defts' last-known addresses were included with the returns and filed under seal. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for defts Dr. Moore and Marie Austin, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on defts at the addresses filed under seal without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/24/13. (kpr)
October 3, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, defts Kelly and Warren are DISMISSED from pltf's complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/3/13. (vjt)
August 30, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a properly completed application to proceed ifp within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. The Clerk shall also send Plaintiff the signature page of his Complaint, for his signature, date, and return. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/30/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewell v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damont Ewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?