Maxwell/G-Doffee v. Clerk et al

Plaintiff: Robert Thomas Maxwell/G-Doffee
Defendant: Richard Clerk, Roderick L Cooksey, Jr, LeKenya Jackson, Chambers, Buttler, Jane Doe, Billy Straughn, M Williams, Gooley, Justine Minor, Eddie Turner and Anthony Jackson
Case Number: 5:2013cv00291
Filed: September 6, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2016 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 147 Motion. Motions in limine due by 7/29/2016; responses due by 8/5/2016. Pre-trial disclosures, trial briefs, and jury instructions due by 8/10/2016. The Court asks the parties to think about the distinction of Maxwell/G-Doffee's first claim and address it in their proposed instructions and pre-trial submissions. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/15/2016. (jak)
March 8, 2016 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 138 Recommendation and overruling G-Doffee's objections, 141 & 142 . The parties' motions for summary judgment and partial summary judgment, 123 & 126 , are denied. The Court refers this case back to Magistrate Jud ge Volpe to appoint a lawyer for G-Doffee and handle any other preliminary issue that arise in the next few months. This case is first-out for jury trial on 6 September 2016. The Court will hold a pretrial conference at 1:30 p.m. Thursday 18 August 2 016. The Court asks Magistrate Judge Volpe to enter any order necessary to ensure G-Doffee's attendance at the pretrial conference. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/8/2016. (jak) (Docket text modified on 3/8/2016 to correct a typographical error). (jak)
October 21, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part and declining in part the recommendation, 113 . Maxwell/G-Doffee's objections, 114 , are overruled in part and sustained in part. The Court declines without prejudice Section IV(C)(2) about the verbal-abuse claims agains t Clark and Cooksey. Cooksey's motion for summary judgment, 96 , is denied without prejudice. The Court adopts the remainder of the recommendation. The ADC Defendants' motion for summary judgment, 96 , is granted in part, denied in part, and denied without prejudice in part. Hillard's separate motion for summary judgment, 107 , is granted and Maxwell/G-Doffee's motion for preliminary injunctive relief, 112 , is denied. Maxwell/G-Doffee's claims against Defendants Cha mbers, Butler, Engstrom, Straughn, Williams, Gooley, Turner, Jenkins, Hillard, LaKenya Jackson, and Anthony Jackson are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Plaintiff's official-capacity claims are dismissed with prejudice. Plaint iff's claims against Justine Minor are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's August 2013 excessive-force and failure to protect claims (federal and state) must be tried. A final scheduling order will issue soon. Any second motion for summary judgment should be filed by 31 December 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/21/2015. (jak)
October 28, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Maxwell/G-Doffee's appeal, 86 , fails; the challenged Orders 79 and 85 are affirmed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/28/2014. (jak)
October 14, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 82 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION. Hamilton's 76 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Hamilton is dismissed without prejudice from this action. Hamilton's request for costs and attorney's fees is denied. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/14/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell/G-Doffee v. Clerk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Thomas Maxwell/G-Doffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick L Cooksey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeKenya Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buttler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justine Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?