Deshazer v. Arkansas, State of et al

Plaintiff: Kendra Katrise Deshazer
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction and Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 5:2014cv00072
Filed: February 26, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with 61 order, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/5/2015. (ljb)
December 18, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 55 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; directing the clerk to alter the docket to reflect that defendant "Wendy Kelly" is appropriately "Wendy Kelley;" granting 49 the motion for summary j udgment; dismissing, with prejudice, defendants John Byus and Wendy Kelley; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from the order and judgment dismissing this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/18/2014. (kdr)
September 11, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety in all respects and denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment;. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 09/11/2014. (rhm)
July 2, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 13 proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; dismissing Defendants the State of Arkansas and the Arkansas Department of Correction without prejudice and denying Plaintiff's request for early release. An in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 07/02/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deshazer v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Katrise Deshazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?