Kennedy v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Jeremy Kennedy
Defendant: Bishop, C Gardner, Iko, Olsen, Ray Hobbs and McKinney
Case Number: 5:2014cv00095
Filed: March 18, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing Kennedy's complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/10/2014. (thd)
September 19, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 78 Partial Recommendation. Kennedy's quasi objections, 80 and 83 , overruled. Summary judgments for a party with the burden of proof are rare as hen's teeth. Kennedy's 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/19/2014. (jak)
July 14, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion for Reconsideration. Discovery must be limited in a Court determines that it may be obtained from a source that is more convenient, or less burdensome or expensive. Judge Young's order is not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/14/2014. (jak)
June 30, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 51 Partial Report and Recommendations. Kennedy's 6 and 34 Motions are denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/30/2014. (jak)
May 14, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion for Reconsideration. Magistrate Judge David Young's 7 Order denying Kennedy appointed counsel is not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/14/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Nga Mahfouz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?