Gillard v. Wilkerson et al

Plaintiff: Levester Gillard, Sr
Defendant: Connie Wilkerson, Kelley, Bland, Rory Griffin, Wendy Kelley, Marie Austin, Iko, William Warren, Debra York, Linder, Quenonis and Moore
Case Number: 5:2014cv00170
Filed: May 1, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 157 Recommended Disposition. The Medical Defendants' 131 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Mr. Gillard's remaining deliberate-indifference claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. Because Mr. Gillard's constituti onal claims have been DISMISSED, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over his state law negligence claims. Those claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Mr. Gillard's Motion to amend and motion for order 124 and 151 are DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/30/2015. (mcz)
June 10, 2015 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 116 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 76 Mr. Gillard's motion for summary judgment; granting 92 Medical Defendants' motion for partial summary judgm ent; dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Gillard's claims against Defendant Quinones based on his failure to exhaust his administrative remedies; and limiting his claims against Defendant Wenoka Kelly to her alleged failure to provide Mr. Gillard an updraft treatment on 12/9/2013. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/10/2015. (ljb)
April 20, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 100 Motion. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to remove docket entries # 97 and # 97 -1 from the record and seal those docket entries. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/20/2015. (jak)
January 6, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion to Compel. The parties have thirty days to respond to provide Mr. Gillard the information requested in his motion to compel. Because Mr. Gillard does not provide any additional information or dates in his pending motion, his request for preliminary injunctive relief, 64 , is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/6/2015. (jak)
November 24, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's claims against Defendant Moore, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/24/2014. (ks)
October 16, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 51 Partial Recommended Disposition. Plaintiff's 46 Motion for preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/16/2014. (mcz)
May 6, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for each of the named Defendants. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the 2 Complaint and a summons for these Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/6/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillard v. Wilkerson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levester Gillard, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quenonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?