Williams v. York et al

Plaintiff: John Henry Williams
Defendant: Debra York, Ludlam, Randy Watson, Moses Jackson, Bolden, Malone, Stephens and Corizon CMS
Case Number: 5:2014cv00281
Filed: July 17, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2016 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 133 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition. The ADC Defendants' 131 Motion to Reconsider Summary Judgment on Qualified Immunity is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/2/2016. (mcz)
August 13, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 71 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Step hens and his claims concerning his missed September 11, 2013, appointment are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Plaintiff's official capacity claims for money damages are dismissed. The Motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/13/2015. (ks)
July 8, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 59 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Plaintiff's 53 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/8/2015. (mcz)
August 29, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 5 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Ludlam are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from an Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/29/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Henry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ludlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon CMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?