Nichols v. Starks-Tyler et al

Plaintiff: Billy Mack Nichols, Jr
Defendant: Angela Starks-Tyler, William Straughn, Marvin Evans and Chambers
Case Number: 5:2015cv00003
Filed: January 5, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2016 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 244 defts' motion for summary judgment is granted 211 ; pltf's claims against defts Starks-Tyler and Chambers are dismissed with prejudice; pltf's remaining motions 168 173 218 226 230 232 233 235 236 237 are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/11/16. (tjb)
December 16, 2015 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 238 pltf's requests for preliminary injunctive relief 167 171 172 and 174 are denied; the motion to Amend Recommended Disposition 240 is denied. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/16/15. (tjb)
August 26, 2015 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 162 , denying 160 Motion to Amend Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/26/15. (tjb)
May 4, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 76 the Partial Recommended Disposition; and denying 48 Mr. Nichols's motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/4/2015. (kdr)
April 16, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in all respects in its entirety 41 Partial Recommended Disposition; and denying 38 Mr. Nichols's petition for writ of mandamus/restraining order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/16/2015. (ljb)
April 14, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 43 granting in part and denying in part defts' 20 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Mr. Nichols may proceed on his deliberate-indifference claims against defts Angela Starks-Tyler and Gregory Chambers; his claims against defts William Straughn and Marvin Evans are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/13/15. (tjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Starks-Tyler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Mack Nichols, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Starks-Tyler
Represented By: Jonathan Quentin Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Straughn
Represented By: Jonathan Quentin Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans
Represented By: Jonathan Quentin Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chambers
Represented By: Jonathan Quentin Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?