Davis et al v. Adams et al

Plaintiff: Carl A Davis, Percy Little, Jr and Mark A Franklin
Defendant: Edward Adams, Tyra Tyler and Greg Bolin
Case Number: 5:2015cv00079
Filed: March 11, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that Service is now proper for Defendants Adams, Tyler, and Bolin. The Clerk of Court is directed to prepare summonses for Defendants Adams, Tyler, and Bolin. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve these Defendants with copies of the com plaint, amended complaints, and summonses. Service is not appropriate for the Doe Defendant. Plaintiffs have thirty days to provide the Court the Doe Defendant's complete name so that she can be timely served. Motion 28 denied for reason previ ously stated in 3 . Mr. Franklin has moved for the Court to order Defendants to allow him to communicate with separate Plaintiff Davis. Mr. Franklin has not provided a sufficient basis for the Court to grand that request, and it is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/30/2015. (jak)
May 21, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining to adopt the 2 ] Recommended Disposition. The Court orders the plaintiffs to file an amended complaint within thirty days from the entry of Order. Failure to submit an amended complaint within thirty days from the entry of this Order may result in dismissal of the action. This action is again referred to Magistrate Judge Deere for disposition or recommended disposition, as appropriate, of all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/21/2015. (ks)
April 28, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Little's claims without prejudice, based on his failure to comply with the Court's March 26, 2015 Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Little as a party plaintiff. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/28/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Little, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyra Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?