Johnson v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Charles Wesley Johnson
Defendant: James Gibson, William Kirk and Connie Hubbard
Case Number: 5:2015cv00116
Filed: April 13, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Based on the 83 Order entered today, this case is dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/25/2016. (ljb)
August 18, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting deft Gibson's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/18/15. (tjb)
April 30, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 4 Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety. Defendants Kelly and Griffin are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/30/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wesley Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?