Holsombach v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Mark Holsombach
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Arkansas Department of Correction and Does
Case Number: 5:2015cv00222
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within thirty days that complies with the directions contained within this Order. His failure to comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of his lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/3/2015. (jak)
November 25, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 33 Partial Recommended Disposition in all respects and Holsombach's request for preliminary injunctive relief is denied, 2 and 22 . Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/25/2015. (jak)
September 28, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to immediately preserve the referenced videos within this Order. If video recordings have been lost, destroyed, or are no longer available (for any reason), Defendants must notify the Court within thirty days and provide a detailed explanation of why that evidence is no longer available and the names of all ADC employees who had any involvement in the destruction or loss of that evidence. The Court may schedule a hearing to take testimony from ADC employees concerning how and why the video recordings were lost or destroyed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/28/2015. (jak)
September 16, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 17 the recommended disposition on the issue of exhaustion; denying 14 defendants' motion for summary judgment on this issue; rejecting 17 the recommended disposition as to its recommendation that plaintiff's claim for injunctive relief be denied; and directing the clerk to remand this case to Judge Deere for proceedings consistent with this order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/16/2015. (kdr)
July 14, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to consolidate case 5:15-CV-00224 into this case.The Clerk is further directed to prepare summonses for the Defendants. The United States Marshal is directed to serve copies of both complaints, with any attachments, and a s ummons for these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Service for all Defendants should be through the ADC Compliance Division. Because Mr. Holsombach has also alleged imminent danger, Director Wendy Kelley should f ile an answer or other response to Mr. Holsombach's complaint within 7 days after service. A hearing will be set on Mr. Holsombach's request for a preliminary injunction by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/14/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holsombach v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Holsombach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?