Mosley et al v. Correctional Care Solutions

Plaintiff: Tommy Mosley
Defendant: Correctional Care Solutions, Arkansas Department of Correction, Wendy Kelley and Danny Burl
Case Number: 5:2015cv00337
Filed: October 21, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Mosley's claims against the Arkansas Department of Correction are dismissed with prejudice. Mosley's other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/24/2016. (jak)
February 22, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the partial recommendation 42 and overruling Mosley's objections, 50 . Kelley and Burl's motion for summary judgment, 14 , is granted; and Mosley's claims against them are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/22/2016. (jak)
November 24, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Partial Recommendation and overruling Mosley's objections, 8 . Mosley's claims against the Arkansas Department of Correction are dismissed with prejudice. His claims about events on 31 October 2015 are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/24/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley et al v. Correctional Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?