Nichols v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: Billy Mack Nichols, Jr
Defendant: Jones, Erica Johnson and Belinda Jackson
Case Number: 5:2016cv00028
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion. This case is closed; and Nichols's appeal has been dismissed. The Court directs the Clerk not to accept any new filings from Nichols in this case without prior approval from the Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/19/2017. (jak)
April 20, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Stay; denying 28 Motion for Order as moot. This case is closed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/20/2016. (jak)
April 12, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Nichols's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/12/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Mack Nichols, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?