Huddleston v. Esaw et al

Plaintiff: Rocky Huddleston
Defendant: Phillip Esaw, Inman, Pascal and Jordan
Case Number: 5:2016cv00059
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 67 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice Defendant Wilson from this action; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/19/2016. (ljb)
July 15, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 53 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice defendant Pascal from this action; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/15/2016. (ljb)
April 25, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 22 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; directing the Clerk of Court to alter the docket to reflect that Defendant "Jordan" is appropriately Defendant &q uot;Wilson"; and dismissing without prejudice defendants Jada Lawrence and Rory Griffin for failure to state any claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/2016. (ljb)
March 23, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition submitted by United States Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe; the Clerk of the Court is directed to add "Stephens" a Captain at Varner Unit as a defendant; defendants Wen dy Kelly, Jeremy Andrews, L. Malone, Moses Jackson, Randy Watson, Inman and Stephens are dismissed without prejudice; the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/23/16. (tjb)
February 29, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the USM to serve Defendants Esaw, Pascal, and Jordan without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/29/2016. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huddleston v. Esaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Esaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pascal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?