Huddleston v. Esaw et al
Plaintiff: |
Rocky Huddleston |
Defendant: |
Phillip Esaw, Inman, Pascal and Jordan |
Case Number: |
5:2016cv00059 |
Filed: |
February 25, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Pine Bluff Office |
County: |
Lincoln |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Leon Holmes |
Presiding Judge: |
Joe J. Volpe |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 10, 2018 |
Filing
118
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Phillip Esaw on the claims of Rocky Huddleston. The complaint of Rocky Huddleston is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/10/2018. (ljb)
|
July 28, 2017 |
Filing
86
ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 85 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part Defendant Esaw's 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order adopting the recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/28/2017. (ljb)
|
September 19, 2016 |
Filing
70
ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 67 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice Defendant Wilson from this action; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/19/2016. (ljb)
|
July 15, 2016 |
Filing
64
ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 53 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice defendant Pascal from this action; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/15/2016. (ljb)
|
April 25, 2016 |
Filing
40
ORDER approving and adopting 22 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; directing the Clerk of Court to alter the docket to reflect that Defendant "Jordan" is appropriately Defendant &q uot;Wilson"; and dismissing without prejudice defendants Jada Lawrence and Rory Griffin for failure to state any claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/2016. (ljb)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Filing
16
ORDER adopting the Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition submitted by United States Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe; the Clerk of the Court is directed to add "Stephens" a Captain at Varner Unit as a defendant; defendants Wen dy Kelly, Jeremy Andrews, L. Malone, Moses Jackson, Randy Watson, Inman and Stephens are dismissed without prejudice; the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/23/16. (tjb)
|
February 29, 2016 |
Filing
4
ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the USM to serve Defendants Esaw, Pascal, and Jordan without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/29/2016. (lej)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?