Halfacre v. Correct Care Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Kenny Halfacre
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, Jason Kelley and Rory Griffin
Case Number: 5:2016cv00313
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JUDGMENT consistent with the Order entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and the corresponding Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/21/2017. (jak)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 41 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 37 motion for summary judgment; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from an Order adopting these Recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/2017. (ljb)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 23 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; granting Defendant's 13 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Griffin for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/10/2017. (ljb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halfacre v. Correct Care Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Halfacre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kelley
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?