Robinson v. Darton et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Blair Deshaun Robinson
Defendant: Ronald Darton, Walker, Stevenson, Claudia Harris, Wendey Kelley, Payne L Dexter, Doe and Spencer
Case Number: 5:2017cv00099
Filed: April 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING 60 Recommended Disposition. Robinson's claims against defendants Spencer and Washington are dismissed without prejudice based on his failure to comply with the 35 7/28/2017, and his failure to prosecute. Robinson's 54 Motion to summons video and 56 Motion for statement are denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/31/2017. (mcz)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER adopting 53 the partial recommended disposition; granting 32 defendants' motion for summary judgment; and dismissing without prejudice Robinson's claims against defendants Darton, Dexter, Harris, Kelley, T. Spencer, Stephens, and Walker. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/2/2017. (kdr)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER adopting with modification 8 the partial recommended disposition. The recommendation to allow Robinson to proceed on his deliberate-indifference claim against defendant Warton is rejected because Warton was included in error. Robinson, howe ver, is allowed to proceed on his: (1) excessive-force claims against defendants Claudia Harris, Ronald Darton, and Walker, (2) failure-to-protect claims against defendants Spencer, Tonda L. Spencer, and Washington, (3) deliberate-indifference claim against defendant Darton, (4) retaliation claims against defendants Harris and Stevenson, and (5) failure-to-train claims against defendants Kelley and Dexter. The rest of Robinson's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/21/2017. (kdr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Darton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Blair Deshaun Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Darton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendey Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne L Dexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?