Latham v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Paul Latham
Defendant: Moore, James Gibson, Wendy Kelley, Does Mental Health Counselor, ADC Commissary and Policy Management Team, Randy Straughn, Washington, Yolanda Linsy and James Shipman
Case Number: 5:2018cv00295
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: Beth Deere
1 Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #4 order entered on this day, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/8/2019. (ljb)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER adopting #3 recommended disposition; and dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/8/2019. (ljb)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Latham's claims be dismissed, without prejudice, based on his failure to comply with the Court's #2 Order requiring him to satisfy the required filing fee. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/18/2018. (csf)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an application to proceed IFP and a jail account information sheet along with a copy of this order; and directing the Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application or pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/16/2018. (cmn)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Paul Latham.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latham v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Mental Health Counselor, ADC Commissary and Policy Management Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Linsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Shipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?