Ward v. Hutchinson et al
Plaintiff: Bruce E Ward
Defendant: William Asa Hutchinson, Benny Magness, James Gibson and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2019cv00294
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #32 order entered today, this case is remanded to Jefferson County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/8/2019. (kdr)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 Bruce Ward's motion for remand; and remanding this case to Jefferson County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/8/2019. (kdr)
October 30, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Bruce E Ward of Supplemental Authority (Braden, Scott)
October 11, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bruce E Ward. (Braden, Scott)
October 7, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 28 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #27 Remand to State Court filed by Bruce E Ward. (Braden, Scott)
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bruce E Ward (Braden, Scott)
September 23, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 NOTICE of Related Case by James Gibson, William Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley, Benny Magness; Case Number 5:03-cv-201 BSM filed by Bruce E Ward. (Braden, Scott)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Related Case by James Gibson, William Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley and Benny Magness; Case Number 5:03-cv-201 BSM. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #23 Second Amended Complaint by James Gibson, William Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley and Benny Magness.(kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 23 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants, filed by Bruce E Ward.(kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 22 MANDATE reversing and remanding the judgment of the Circuit Court. Entered by Arkansas Supreme Court Clerk on 12/20/2018. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 FORMAL ORDER: Petitioner's Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus is moot. Entered by Arkansas Supreme Court Clerk on 4/21/2017. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 CORRECTED FORMAL ORDER vacating Arkansas Supreme Court Order issued 4/14/2017; and granting Appellant's Petition for Emergency Stay of Execution. Entered by Arkansas Supreme Court Clerk on 4/21/2017. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 FORMAL ORDER granting Petitioner's Petition for Emergency Stay of Execution. Entered by Arkansas Supreme Court Clerk on 4/21/2017. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 EMERGENCY NOTICE OF APPEAL and Designation of Record by Bruce E Ward. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Dismissing Complaint. Signed by Jefferson County Circuit Court Judge on 4/13/2017. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Status Conference and Competency Hearing by Bruce E Ward. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #14 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Resppnse to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by William Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley and Benny Magness. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #11 Amended Complaint and Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by William Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley and Benny Magness. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Scholfield Harris on behalf of All Defendants. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Reply to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bruce E Ward. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against William Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley, Benny Magness and Mark Cashion, filed by Bruce E Ward.(kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 Objection to Defendants' Motion re #4 Motion Pertaining to Evaluation filed by Bruce E Ward. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss and Response to #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by William Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley and Benny Magness. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by William Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley, Benny Magness and Randy Watson. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent G. Holt on behalf of James Gibson, William Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley and Benny Magness. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Brad K. Newman on behalf of James Gibson, William Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley and Benny Magness. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Reconsider Order to Record Psychiatric Visit by Bruce E Ward. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Pertaining to Evaluation of Plaintiff Scheduled for 4/1/2017, and for Expedited Consideration, by James Gibson, William Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley and Benny Magness. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bruce E Ward. (kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bruce E Ward.(kdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Jefferson County Circuit Court, Case Number 35CV-17-206. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073879. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Hutchinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Asa Hutchinson
Represented By: Kent G. Holt
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Christian Scholfield Harris
Represented By: Brad K. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Magness
Represented By: Kent G. Holt
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Christian Scholfield Harris
Represented By: Brad K. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Represented By: Kent G. Holt
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Christian Scholfield Harris
Represented By: Brad K. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Kent G. Holt
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Christian Scholfield Harris
Represented By: Brad K. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E Ward
Represented By: Scott W. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?