Pitts v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Pitts
Defendant: John Doe Thompson and Merrill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00297
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma Pauperis be denied; #9 Plaintiff's Motions for Order to Show Cause and for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order be denied; and this case be dismissed without prejudice. Should Plaintiff wish to continue prosecuting this case, he be required to submit the statutory filing fee of $400 to the Clerk within 10 days of the date of this Order, along with a motion to reopen the case. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/5/2019. (kdr)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (ljb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #13 Order by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (kdr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #2 Complaint filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (Docketed pursuant to #13 Order.)(kdr)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 #12 Plaintiff's Motions to Amend; denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Counsel; directing the Clerk to re-docket #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Order as a brief in support of Complaint; and directing Plaintiff to file a second Amended Complaint in accordance with the directions set forth in this Order and the 9/16/2019 Order within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/4/2019. (kdr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Amend #2 Complaint by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (ljb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Kenneth Ray Pitts. (ljb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (ljb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, for Preliminary Injunction, and for Temporary Restraining Order by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (ljb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (ljb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (ljb)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER holding in abeyance ruling on #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff a 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 complaint form with this Order; and directing the Plaintiff to amend his Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/16/2019. (kdr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (kdr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Kenneth Ray Pitts.(kdr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (kdr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts.(kdr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?