Tidwell v. Bland et al
Plaintiff: David Lee Tidwell
Defendant: WellPath Medical Healthcare, Smith and Estella Bland
Case Number: 5:2019cv00353
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot #6 United States Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray's recommended disposition because David Tidwell has moved to amend his complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 01/10/2020. (ajt)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Production of Documents by David Lee Tidwell. (llg)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by David Lee Tidwell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint) (llg)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending Tidwell be allowed to proceed with his Eighth Amendment inadequate medical care claims against Defendants Estella Bland and Dr. Smith, and that service be ordered on them; Tidwell's FTCA claim be dismissed with prejudice; Tidwell's claim against Defendant WellPath Medical Healthcare be dismissed without prejudice; the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommendation would not be taken in good faith #1 ; Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/19/19. (tjb) (Docket text modified on 11/20/2019 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #2 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be collected from plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been paid to the Clerk; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Varner Supermax Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/14/2019. (kdr)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 5:19-cv-05213. Electronic file copy of case file, transfer order, and docket sheet received.
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Arkansas, Pine Bluff Division. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on November 13, 2019. (src) [Transferred from arwd on 11/13/2019.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by David Lee Tidwell. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(src) [Transferred from arwd on 11/13/2019.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Estella Bland, Smith, Well Path Medical Healthcare, filed by David Lee Tidwell.(src) [Transferred from arwd on 11/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell v. Bland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellPath Medical Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?