Brown v. Hickman et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Brown
Defendant: Danny Hickman, Jason Day, Bob King, Ryan Watson, Sue Fallon, Dr. Lee and Mandy Jones
Case Number: 3:2012cv03150
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 44 Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; ; Dr. Lee, Ryan Watson, Mandy Jones and Bob King terminated. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 11, 2015. (src)
April 11, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 the Motion to Amend the complaint is granted however Plaintiff's motion to add Yolanda Watson as a Defendant is denied, and granting 17 Motion to Dismiss separate Defendant Sue Fallon (Boone Co unty Jail Secretary) is treated as a stipulation of dismissal and is to be noted on the docket sheet that she is no longer a Defendant. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form to use for filing his amended complaint, which is to be submitted by 4/30/2013. The Defendants are directed to file a summary judgment motion by 6/28/2013. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 11, 2013. (sh)
November 29, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to file 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Daniel Ray Brown. Further to return the IFP to Plaintiff, Plaintiff is given until 12/14/12, to either have the certificate portion of the IFP completed or pay the the $350.00 filing fee. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 29, 2012. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Hickman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?