Waller v. Turner et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth L Waller
Defendant: G. Turner, Miller, Nash, Herro, K Williams and Stoval
Case Number: 4:2010cv04059
Filed: May 4, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 46 Report and Recommendations, granting 44 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Kenneth L Waller and Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on May 3, 2011. (cap)
October 6, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 36 Report and Recommendations, denying 31 Motion for Injunction filed by Kenneth L Waller. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 6, 2010. (cap) Modified on 10/6/2010 to edit text (cap).
August 26, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto for 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenneth L Waller. Denying 27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenneth L Waller. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 26, 2010. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waller v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?