Dixon v. Stovall et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Dixon
Defendant: Cranford, Sgt. Giles, Sgt. Bayless, Corporal Lafayette, Adams, S Smith, Shivers, Sgt. Raggs, Ron Stovall, Captain Hartline and Cpt. Heintzlman
Case Number: 4:2011cv04015
Filed: February 3, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Paul K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying issuance of writs for Garner, Thompson, or Morrison to be brought to the trial in this matter by the ADC, and denying issuance of subpoena for Nurse Cranford re 92 Response to Order to Show Cause. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 5, 2014. (mll)
December 12, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 83 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. T. Hanning, Sgt. Miller, Shivers (Jailer, Miller County Detention Center), S Smith (Jailer, Miller County Detention Center), Sgt. Bayless (Sgt., Miller County Detention Center) and Sgt. Giles (Sgt., Miller County Detention Center) terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 12, 2013. (mll)
September 4, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 48 Report and Recommendations; granting 25 Motion for Summary Judgment and all claims against Nurse Cranford are dismissed with prejudice. Nurse Cranford terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 4, 2012. (cap)
October 20, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and Plaintiff's claims against separate defendant Sgt. Raggs are dismissed. Sgt. Raggs terminated. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 20, 2011. (cap)
February 3, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that the interests of justice would best be served by transferring this case, the Clerk is hereby directed to transfer this case immediately to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas, Texarkana Division. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/3/11. (vjt) [Transferred from ared on 2/3/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Stovall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cranford
Represented By: James Levi Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Giles
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Bayless
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Lafayette
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shivers
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Raggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Stovall
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Hartline
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt. Heintzlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?