Moses v. Oller et al

Plaintiff: Keith D Moses
Defendant: Oller, Cassey, Dunham and Susan Hanson
Case Number: 4:2015cv04002
Filed: January 7, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 29, 2016. (mll)
March 2, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 32 MOTION to Compel filed by Dunham. Plaintiff's answers to Defendant's discovery requests due by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, March 22, 2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 2, 2016. (mll)
March 1, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's answers to Defendant's discovery requests due by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, March 22, 2015. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 1, 2016. (mll)
February 25, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 27 Motion to Compel ; denying as moot 17 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 25, 2016. (mll)
March 11, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting IFP, directing Clerk to assess filing fee and collect funds from Prison Account of Keith D. Moses; granting 6 Motion to Supplement Complaint. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 11, 2015. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service) (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses v. Oller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith D Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?