Mendoza v. Wise et al

Plaintiff: Santos Mendoza
Defendant: Wise, Jones, Heath Ross, Todd Willy and Davis
Case Number: 4:2016cv04029
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 19 . Plaintiff's case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 28, 2016. (mll)
July 26, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Service. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 26, 2016. (mll)
July 11, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 ; denying 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 11, 2016. (mll) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/11/2016 with corrected party caption) (mll).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Wise et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Willy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?