Hawkins v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Shawn Hawkins
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2020cv04032
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Cards)(Vammen, Fritzie)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, filed by Shawn Hawkins. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS tracking confirmation)(Vammen, Fritzie)
April 29, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Susan O. Hickey and Honorable Barry A. Bryant as the referral judge. (mll)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mag Consent)(mll) (Attachment 1 replaced with corrected mag consent on 4/15/2020). (mll)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll) (Main Document 4 replaced with corrected Summons on 4/17/2020). (mll)
April 14, 2020 Complaint fee received: $400.00, receipt number 46104001295. (mll)
April 14, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/16/2020. (mll)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Attorney General; US Attorney: SSA Commissioner for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Vammen, Fritzie)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Shawn Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Evidence of Timely Appeal to Appeals Council)(Vammen, Fritzie) Modified to correct Defendant on 4/15/2020. (mll)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Shawn Hawkins. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Hawkins
Represented By: Fritzie M. Vammen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?