Parrish et al v. Bentonville School District et al

Plaintiff: Ron Parrish, Lauren Parrish, Victor Craig, Laura Craig, Michael Laws, Chastidy Laws and Rachelle Siverly
Defendant: Bentonville School District, Michael Poore, Tanya Sharp, Rebecca Powers, Travis Riggs, Rudy Upshaw, Wendi Cheatham, Willie Cowgur, Grant Lightle, Maureen Bradshaw, Arkansas Department of Education and Johnny Key
Case Number: 5:2015cv05083
Filed: April 13, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2016 149 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 113 Motion for Relief; Motion 131 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 12, 2016. (rg)
April 28, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 45 Motion to Amend Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Partial Dismissal; granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Partial Dismissal; granting 56 Motion to Modify Sched uling Order; denying as moot 64 Motion to Compel ; denying as moot 68 Motion to Compel ; denying 70 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 76 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal; d enying 79 Motion to Strike ; and denying 85 Motion to Strike. The clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Grant Lightle, Michael Poore, Rebecca Powers, Travis Riggs, Tanya Sharp, Rudy Upshaw, Wendi Cheatham, Willie Cowgur, Joe Quinn, Matth ew Burgess, and Brent Leas as parties to this action. An amended Final Scheduling Order will be entered setting a new trial date and deadlines. Counsel for all parties are directed to submit proposals as to severance of claims by Monday, May 9, 2016. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 28, 2016. (jas)
December 21, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion 10 and 13 ; ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file an Amended Complaint by 1/15/2016; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 21, 2015. (rg) Modified text on 12/21/2015 (jas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish et al v. Bentonville School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Parrish
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Represented By: Kitty L. Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Parrish
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Represented By: Kitty L. Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Craig
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Represented By: Kitty L. Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Craig
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Represented By: Kitty L. Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Laws
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Represented By: Kitty L. Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chastidy Laws
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Represented By: Kitty L. Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle Siverly
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Represented By: Kitty L. Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bentonville School District
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Poore
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Sharp
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Powers
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Riggs
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Upshaw
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendi Cheatham
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Cowgur
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Lightle
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Bradshaw
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?